Webb v. Flowers

Plaintiff: Jeremy Webb
Defendant: Darrell Flowers
Case Number: 4:2013cv00719
Filed: December 13, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants, Billy Kelly, Darrell Flowers against Jeremy Webb. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/16/2014. (kcs)
August 12, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff, to file within 30 days, a Response to 34 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiff is advised that if he fails timely do so this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/12/2014. (kcs)
January 14, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Monetary Injunctive Relief and Declaratory Judgment; and denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of 10 Motion for Monet ary Injunctive Relief and Declaratory Judgment as Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The US Marshal is directed to serve a copy of this Order and Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on Defendant Flowers without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/14/2014. (rhm)
December 16, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/16/2013. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Flowers
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?