Hunt v. Cones et al

Plaintiff: Stanley Ray Hunt
Defendant: Derwin Lasker, Scott Huffman, Rodrick Cones and John Randall
Case Number: 4:2013cv00740
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 20 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; granting 13 Defendants' motion to dismiss; and dismissing plaintiff's claims against defendants Huffman, Lasker, and Randall, with prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/29/2014. (kdr)
March 17, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 the partial recommended disposition; dismissing, with prejudice, plaintiff Stanley Ray Hunt's claims against inmate Rodrick Cones; and dismissing, without prejudice, Hunt's official capacity claims against defendants Huffman, Lasker, and Randall. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/17/2014. (kdr)
February 25, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to prepare summonses for Defendants Huffman, Lasker, and Randall. The USMS is directed to serve copies of the 2 Complaint and a summons for these Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Service for these Defendants should be through the Faulkner County Sheriffs Department, 801 Locust Street, Conway, Arkansas 72032. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/25/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Cones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derwin Lasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodrick Cones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Ray Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?