Fatemi v. Rahn et al

Defendant: University of Arkansas, Vera Chenault, John Day, Debra Fiser, Dan Rahn, University of Arkansas System and University of Arkansas Board of Trustees
Plaintiff: Nasrin Fatemi
Case Number: 4:2013cv00742
Filed: December 26, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 21 MOTION to dismiss as specified and converted to a motion for summary judgment on the HIPAA-related retaliation claims under Title VII, the First Amendment and the ACRA. All other claims dismissed. Request to amend, 30 , denied as futile on the dismissed claims and as unnecessary on the HIPAA-related retaliation claims. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/24/2014. (jak)
January 12, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/12/2015. (jak)
January 12, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The University of Arkansas is dismissed with prejudice as a defendant. Dr. Fatemi's 1981 and equal protection claims are dismissed without prejudice. Dr. Fatemi's due process claim is dismissed with prejudice. Dr. Fatermi's retaliation claims under Title VII, the First Amendment, and the Arkansas Civil Rights Act are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/12/2015. (jak)
January 22, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 NOTICE of Related Case by Nasrin Fatemi; Case Number 4:11-cv-458 filed by Nasrin Fatemi. The Court agrees that this case is related to Fatemi v. Long et al., 4:11-cv-458-DPM, and that direct assignmentis warranted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/22/14. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fatemi v. Rahn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vera Chenault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Fiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nasrin Fatemi
Represented By: Nathan Goldberg
Represented By: Denise Reid Hoggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.