Conners v. Gusano's Chicago Style Pizzeria et al

Plaintiff: Jacqueline L Conners, Rachel Hobbs, Blaire Larson, Maria Campanelli, Katey Tiller, Sarina Ellis, Cecilie Washburn, Whitney Koch and Lacie Morgan
Defendant: Gusano's Chicago Style Pizzeria, Catfish Pies Inc, Crazy Pies Inc, Fayetteville Pies Inc, Gusano's Chicago Style Pizzeria of Bella Vista Inc, Hendrix Brands Inc, Pizza Profits Inc, Show Me Pies Inc, Ben Bisenthal, Clearwater Social Club Inc, Three Buddies Incorporated and Timothy Chappell
Case Number: 4:2014cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2015 218 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 217 notice of acceptance of judgment filed by plaintiffs, judgment is hereby entered in their favor and against defendants Catfish Pies, Inc., Three Buddies Incorporated, and Ben Biesenthal in the amount of $16,021.36, t o be apportioned and allocated among plaintiffs as set forth in the notice of acceptance. Plaintiffs are directed to file their motion for attorney's fees and costs no later than 14 days after the entry of this judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/22/2015. (ljb)
February 13, 2015 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. The motion is granted as to plaintiff's claim that defendants' cooks were not tip employees. Summary judgment is denied as to the remaining claims. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/13/2015. (thd)
October 9, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 100 Laken Neal's, Sarina Ellis's, Lacie Morgan's, and Katey Tiller's motion to be voluntarily dismissed. Their claims against all defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/09/2014. (rhm)
April 30, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/30/2014. (fcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conners v. Gusano's Chicago Style Pizzeria et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline L Conners
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Hobbs
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaire Larson
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Campanelli
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katey Tiller
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarina Ellis
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilie Washburn
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Koch
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacie Morgan
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gusano's Chicago Style Pizzeria
Represented By: Ashley R. Hudson
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catfish Pies Inc
Represented By: Ashley R. Hudson
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crazy Pies Inc
Represented By: Ashley R. Hudson
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayetteville Pies Inc
Represented By: Ashley R. Hudson
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gusano's Chicago Style Pizzeria of Bella Vista Inc
Represented By: Ashley R. Hudson
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendrix Brands Inc
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: Amber Davis-Tanner
Represented By: Joseph R. Falasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pizza Profits Inc
Represented By: Ashley R. Hudson
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Show Me Pies Inc
Represented By: Ashley R. Hudson
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Bisenthal
Represented By: Ashley R. Hudson
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearwater Social Club Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Buddies Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?