Biddle v. Midland Funding LLC et al

Plaintiff: Angela Renee Biddle
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Midland Credit Management Inc, Midland Funding LLC and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2014cv00060
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 43 Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on May 27, 2014, and the 70 Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on this date, Plaintiff Angela Renee Biddle's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/13/2015. (ks)
May 27, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against the Midland Defendants are dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/27/2014. (ks) (Docket text modified on 5/27/2014 to correct the filing event).(jak)
March 11, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to assign this case to another judge. Signed at the direction of the Court on 3/11/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biddle v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc
Represented By: Michael Burnett Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Michael Burnett Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Renee Biddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?