Barner et al v. Thompson/Center Arms Company Inc et al

Plaintiff: Mark Barner and Charloe Barner
Defendant: Thompson/Center Arms Company Inc, Thompson/Center Arms Company LLC, John Does and John Doe Corporations
Case Number: 4:2014cv00090
Filed: February 14, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to 51 stipulation of dismissal, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/28/2016. (mef)
June 27, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 38 Opinion and Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this action be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/27/2014. (ks)
April 1, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 04/01/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barner et al v. Thompson/Center Arms Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Barner
Represented By: Addison Kennon Goff, IV
Represented By: Connie L. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charloe Barner
Represented By: Addison Kennon Goff, IV
Represented By: Connie L. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson/Center Arms Company Inc
Represented By: Edie R. Ervin
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson/Center Arms Company LLC
Represented By: Edie R. Ervin
Represented By: William M. Griffin, III
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Malsch
Represented By: Anthony M. Pisciotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?