Dardanelle, City of et al v. Department of Transportation et al

Plaintiff: Dardanelle, City of and Yell County Wildlife Federation
Defendant: Department of Transportation, Federal Highway Administration, Arkansas State Highway & Transportation Department, River Valley Regional Intermodal Authority and Department of Defense
Case Number: 4:2014cv00098
Filed: February 19, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Yell
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 30:181
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2017 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Corps to produce the documents contained within this Order to further supplement its administrative record as soon as practicable and no later than 7/7/2017. 108 Motion, as supplemented by No. 122 , granted as modified. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/8/2017. (jak)
July 13, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint status report, 95 , noted and appreciated. The Court approves the schedule in principle, but would prefer date-certain deadlines. The initial due dates are as follows: Amended Complaint - 8/12/2016; Corps's administrative record - 9/16/2016; any Motion to supplement - 10/7/2016. The Court will set the suggested briefing schedule, and oral argument, on dates certain after the record is settled. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/2016. (jak)
June 17, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint Report 93 noted and appreciated. The motion to supplement, 90 , is denied without prejudice. The parties should revisit the supplementation issue, if need be, down the line. The Court looks forward to getting the upcoming report by 8 July 2016. The Court requests that all the parties keep in mind the age of this case and the need for resolution sooner rather than later. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/17/2016. (jak)
March 8, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court notes and appreciates the federal defendants' notice of decision, 82 . The stay is lifted. The supplemental administrative record must be filed by 7 April 2016. The briefing schedule previously approved, 62 at 2-3 and 63 , is implemented. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/8/2016. (jak)
December 22, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Motion 74 granted with a caveat: No. 71, 71-1 and 71-2 are stricken; but the federal defendants must include No. 71-2 in the supplemental administrative record and consider those comments. Motion to lift stay, 79 , denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/22/2015. (jak)
March 26, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Federal defendants' status report, 62 , noted and appreciated. Proposed briefing schedule approved. The Court will enter a scheduling order with dates after the supplemental record is filed. Joint status report due by 18 May 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/26/2015. (jak)
November 18, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 52 Motion to Reconsider. The 57 request for a stay is granted. First joint report due by 7 January 2015. Second joint report due by 20 March 2015. At the minimum, the Court needs to know the Corps' expected da te for its ROD. And in the second joint report, the parties must propose a new schedule for handling the case on the merits. The Court will, if necessary, revisit whether the Corps should be a party after the Federal Highway Administration completes its reevaluation. The Court remains open for Plaintiffs to seek some kind of emergency relief if the need arises. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/18/2014. (jak)
August 28, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion. All claims against the United States Army Corps of Engineers are dismissed without prejudice. The Federal Highway Administration's deadline for filing the administrative record is extended without objection to 10 October 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/28/2014. (jak)
August 1, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A Final Scheduling Order adopting the proposed schedule will issue. A mutually convenient date during the last week of August for a hearing on the motion to dismiss will be arranged. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/1/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dardanelle, City of et al v. Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dardanelle, City of
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yell County Wildlife Federation
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Transportation
Represented By: Jeremy S. Hessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Represented By: Jeremy S. Hessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State Highway & Transportation Department
Represented By: Michelle Lee Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Valley Regional Intermodal Authority
Represented By: Sherry P. Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Represented By: Jeremy S. Hessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?