Rooks v. Bradley et al

Plaintiff: Wayne Rooks, Jr
Defendant: David Bradley, Randy Murry, Kenny Dunham and Does
Case Number: 4:2014cv00149
Filed: March 11, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Van Buren
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Rooks's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/2015. (jak)
March 3, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting unopposed recommendation, 58 . Motion for partial summary judgment, 48 , granted. All claims against Bradley, Murray, Dunham, and Hensley are dismissed with prejudice. Rooks's excessive-force claim against Ragland is the only remaining claim. It appears that claim will need to be tried. If so, Magistrate Judge Kearney should appoint counsel to try the case for Rooks. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/3/2015. (jak)
August 18, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion for Contempt and for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 08/18/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rooks v. Bradley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Rooks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?