Simpson v. Little Rock, City of et al

Plaintiff: Cedrick Simpson
Defendant: Little Rock, City of, Greg Siegler and Does
Case Number: 4:2014cv00165
Filed: March 17, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT: Simpson's claims against the Doe defendants are dismissed without prejudice. As against the City and Siegler, Counts 1-2 and 5-7 of the complaint are dismissed with prejudice; counts 3-4 and 8-12 are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/25/2016. (jak) (Docket text modified on 7/25/2016 pursuant to instruction from chambers). (jak)
July 22, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion. Counts 1-2 and 5-7 of Simpson's complaint will be dismissed with prejudice; Counts 3-4 and 8-12 will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/22/2016. (jak)
January 29, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court would appreciate the parties addressing these topics in their trial briefs: qualified immunity and the effect of acquittal on the Brady claim. Those briefs are due 5 February 2016. They must be less than ten pages. No responding briefs needed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/29/2016. (jak)
May 16, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/16/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Little Rock, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedrick Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Siegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?