McCall v. Tucker et al

Plaintiff: Jamie Shawn McCall
Defendant: Matthew Tucker, Tommy Balentine, Larry Lute and Mitchell
Case Number: 4:2014cv00212
Filed: April 7, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 69 Order entered on this day, Mr. McCall's claims against Defendants Matthew Tucker and James Mitchell are DISMISSED. It is certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/14/2015. (ks)
January 28, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file on or before 2/27/2015, a Response to 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Matthew Tucker, James Mitchell and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the instructions in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/28/2015. (kcs)
December 2, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, as specified in this Order 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; granting in part, as specified in this Order 32 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/02/2014. (kcs)
August 14, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/14/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Tucker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Shawn McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Balentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Lute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?