Snowmagic Inc v. Aquapark Holdings LLC

Plaintiff: Snowmagic Inc
Defendant: Aquapark Holdings LLC
Counter_claimant: Aquapark Holdings LLC
Counter_defendant: Snowmagic Inc
Case Number: 4:2014cv00232
Filed: April 16, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 08/21/2015. (rhm)
August 20, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Having been notified that a settlement has been reached in this matter, the Court finds that this case should be dismissed. The complaint and all claims in this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains complete jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this order and to reopen the action if it is satisfactorily shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/20/2015. (ks)
April 15, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 6 Motion for Transfer. The Clerk shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas, Little Rock Division. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/15/2014. (ir) Modified on 4/15/2014 (ir). [Transferred from flsd on 4/16/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snowmagic Inc v. Aquapark Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snowmagic Inc
Represented By: Jose L. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aquapark Holdings LLC
Represented By: David A. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Aquapark Holdings LLC
Represented By: David A. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Snowmagic Inc
Represented By: Jose L. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?