Dixon v. Arkansas Department of Human Services

Plaintiff: Brindon Dixon
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services
Case Number: 4:2014cv00295
Filed: May 13, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 35 Opinion and Order, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/12/2014. (jak)
October 9, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 21 26 Motions to Dismiss. If Dixon wishes to file a second amended complaint, she must seek leave to do so within 30 days from the entry of this Order. If she does not seek leave to amend her complaint within 30 days from the entry of this Order, the Court will enter a judgment dismissing her claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/9/2014. (ks)
July 30, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot without prejudice 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/30/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Arkansas Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services
Represented By: Cory Allen Cox
Represented By: Bradford C. Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brindon Dixon
Represented By: Micheal L. Alexander(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?