Bailey v. USA

Plaintiff: Shirley Bailey
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 4:2014cv00325
Filed: May 28, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2017 95 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on the counter-claim in favor of the United States against Shirley Bailey for unpaid liabilities assessed against her for the first, second, third, and fourth quarters of 2007 and the first, second, and third quarters of 2008, in the amount of $500,000, plus interest at the rate provided by law and other statutory additions accruing from and after 5/24/2017. Bailey's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its respective costs, including attorney's fees and other costs associated with this litigation. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/30/2017. (jak)
June 16, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court notes and appreciates the parties' stipulation for entry of judgment, 90 . The Court will enter judgment, in its preferred form, that tracks the substance of the parties' stipulation. Joint report on loose ends due by 6/23/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/16/2017. (jak)
May 24, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court was informally advised that the proposed settlement has been approved by all necessary officials The Court will withhold judgment and give the parties time to consummate their deal. Jointly proposed papers with all the details about how we can bring this matter to a conclusion on the docket due by 6/16/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/24/2017. (jak)
May 18, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion and suspending the Amended Final Scheduling Order, 19 . The Court can't keep the 11 July 2016 trial setting. A Second Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/18/2016. (jak) (Docket text modified on 5/18/2016 to correct the description of the document filed). (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Bailey
Represented By: Nicolas E. Corry
Represented By: Reba Mangum Wingfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?