Torti Sr v. Hoag et al

Plaintiff: Richard A Torti Sr
Defendant: Debra Hoag, Gentry Partners Limited and John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA
Case Number: 4:2014cv00330
Filed: June 2, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 88 John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA's motion to dismiss; and dismissing, with prejudice, 1 the complaint of Richard A. Torti, Sr., as successor Trustee of the Stuart Family 1997 Trust. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/26/2016. (kdr)
October 17, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss; granting 30 Motion to Strike. All of Richard Torti's claims against John Hancock Life Insurance Company are dismissed without prejudice. Richard Torti's claims against Debra Hoag and Gentry Partners Limited for deceit, violation of the Arkansas Deceptive Trade Practices Act, and civil conspiracy are dismissed without prejudice. Richard Torti has stated claims against Hoag and Gentry Partners for breach of fiduciary duty and negligence as regards the $1.7 million policy loan plus interest, so those claims are not dismissed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/17/2014. (ks)
August 4, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (wrong case). (ks) (Docket text modified on 8/4/2014.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torti Sr v. Hoag et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A Torti Sr
Represented By: Christopher O. Parker
Represented By: James H. Penick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Hoag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentry Partners Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?