Jackson v. Jones et al

Plaintiff: Michelle Doreen Jackson
Defendant: Woody Jones, Russellville Sheriff Department and Pope County Jail
Case Number: 4:2014cv00348
Filed: June 10, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pope
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Recommendations 48 submitted by United States Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray; defendant's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/7/16. (tjb)
January 8, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 11 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendants Graham, Pengaricano, Shaffer, Leryea and Liudmilan are DISMISSED without prejudice due to Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted against them. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/8/2015. (ks)
November 25, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff is allowed to proceed with her inadequate medical care claims against Defendant Woody Jones. All other claims and Defendants are DISMISSED, without prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk of Court shall prepare summons for Defendant Woody Jones and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Summon s, 1 Complaint, 7 First Amended Complaint, and 9 Second Amended Coomplaint, and this Order on plaintiff without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. The Court certifies than an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/25/2014. (ks)
June 12, 2014 2 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/12/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Doreen Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woody Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russellville Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pope County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?