Allen v. Staley et al

Plaintiff: Shaun C Allen
Defendant: John Staley, Bufford, John Does, Lonoke County and Dallas
Case Number: 4:2014cv00481
Filed: August 18, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 82 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 69 Motion for Summary Judgment and 73 Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment are DENIED. Defendants' 75 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiffs complaint against Defendants Staley, Bufford, Dallas, and Grigsby is DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's complaint against John Does is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/29/2015. (mcz)
March 6, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 57 proposed findings and recommendations in their entirety and denying 52 Motion for Order, which is construed as a Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/5/2015. (thd)
October 9, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Amend Complaint is denied, and Defendant Lonoke County is DISMISSED from this action, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/9/2014. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Staley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun C Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bufford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonoke County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?