Gage v. Burger King et al

Plaintiff: Antoine B Gage
Defendant: Flis Enterprises Inc, Burger King, Lisa Martin and Heather Hill
Case Number: 4:2014cv00497
Filed: August 26, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Gage's 2 complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to all claims and all defendants. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/7/2015. (ks)
October 27, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff Gage to provide service information for Burger King, FLIS Enterprises Inc., and Martin by 30 October 2014. 13 Motion denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/27/2014. (jak)
September 19, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER consolidating these cases under Case No. 4:14-cv-497. In forma pauperis motion granted. Motion for appointment of counsel denied without prejudice. Gage must file information about the registered agents authorized to receive service of process for Burger King and FLIS Enterprises Inc. by 30 September 2014. The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve Martin and Hill. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/19/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gage v. Burger King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flis Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine B Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?