Allen v. Newburn et al

Plaintiff: Eric Lee Allen
Defendant: Orlando Newburn, Vanorris Sims, Benjamin Foster and Brawley
Case Number: 4:2014cv00602
Filed: October 15, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 54 order that was entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/19/2016. (ljb)
January 5, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 32 Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety in all respects; denying 26 27 motions for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/5/2015. (ks)
October 29, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety in all respects 5 partial recommended disposition; dismissing without prejudice Allen's claims against Randy Morgan; and dismissing with prejudice Allen's claims against the Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility and defendant Brawley. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/29/2014. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Newburn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lee Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Newburn
Represented By: Sam Baber
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Represented By: Patrick L. Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanorris Sims
Represented By: Sam Baber
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Represented By: Patrick L. Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Foster
Represented By: Sam Baber
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Represented By: Patrick L. Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brawley
Represented By: Sam Baber
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Represented By: Patrick L. Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?