Billings v. Johnson

Plaintiff: Bryant Anthony Billings
Defendant: Johnson
Case Number: 4:2014cv00674
Filed: November 21, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2016 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition submitted by United States Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe 148 ; the Clerk is directed to alter the docket to reflect defendant "C. Banister" as "Canera Banister"; d efendant Carl Lynn Johnson's motion to adopt 127 and defendants' motion for summary judgment 126 is granted in all respects save their requests for a with prejudice dismissal of this action; plaintiff's claims against Carl Lynn Joh nson, Doc Holladay, Sarah Speer, Randy Morgan, Canera Banister, Frank Onyeokeziri, and Bertha Lowe are dismissed without prejudice; defendants' motion to appoint custodian, motion for summary judgment 121 and motion for extension of time 156 are denied as moot; the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/21/16. (tjb)
January 20, 2016 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Court declines to adopt the 133 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition; the Court finds plaintiff's objections are an untimely response to the motion for summary judgment 127 ; the Court directs the Magistrate Judge to reconsider the motion for summary judgment in light of plaintiff's objections. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/20/16. (tjb)
November 18, 2015 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 96 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendant Jane/John Doe # 1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's claim for injunctive relief in his 94 Fourth Amended Complaint is DENIED. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/18/2015. (ks)
October 15, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall prepare summons and the USM shall serve Defendants Onyeokeziri, Banister, and Lowe without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/15/2015. (lej)
June 4, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 49 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing Defendant Shawn Smith without prejudice; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/4/2015. (ljb)
May 1, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting [30 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendant Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc. and all Doe Defendants are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/1/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billings v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Anthony Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?