McFall v. Southern Health Partners Inc

Plaintiff: Ronny Ray McFall
Defendant: Southern Health Partners Inc
Case Number: 4:2014cv00716
Filed: December 4, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 46 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied, and the case is closed. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 01/07/2016. (rhm)
September 1, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Order approving and adopting 27 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 12 motion to dismiss; and denying Mr. McFall's 28 motion to strike. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/01/2015. (rhm)
June 19, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward an IFP application to Plaintiff. Plaintiff is directed to submit the $350.00 statutory filing fee, or to complete and sign the IFP application, and file it, no later than 30 days after the entry date of this Order. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 6/19/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFall v. Southern Health Partners Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronny Ray McFall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?