Butler v. Faulkner County Jail et al

Plaintiff: Gary Butler
Defendant: Faulkner County Jail, Stone and Doe
Case Number: 4:2014cv00739
Filed: December 17, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 60 days of the entry of this Order, a Motion for Service containing the full name and service address for Defendant Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/26/2015. (kcs)
February 19, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; allowing plaintiff to proceed with his inadequate medical care claims against defendant Doe; dismissing defendants Faulkner County Jail and Stone, without prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/19/2015. (kdr)
December 22, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/22/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Faulkner County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faulkner County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?