Hudson Enterprises Inc et al v. Risk Placement Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
Hudson Enterprises Inc, Ray Hudson and Debra Hudson |
Defendant: |
Risk Placement Services Inc and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Insurance Companies |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00012 |
Filed: |
January 8, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Little Rock Office |
County: |
Pulaski |
Presiding Judge: |
D. P. Marshall |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 18, 2016 |
Filing
73
ORDER denying 60 Motion. The equities overcome the presumption of awarding costs. The Court therefore declines to award any. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/2016. (jak)
|
July 5, 2016 |
Filing
68
ORDER requesting the Marina to provide an affidavit about its finances, including assets, liabilities, income, and expenses. Please file the affidavit under seal by 7/15/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/5/2016. (jak)
|
May 25, 2016 |
Filing
59
JUDGMENT: Ray Hudson and Debra Hudson's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Hudson Enterprises, Inc.'s unjust enrichment claim against Risk Placement Services, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. The rest of Hudson Enterprises, Inc.� 39;s claims against Risk Placement Services, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Hudson Enterprises, Inc.'s claims against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Insurance Companies, Subscribing to Policy #10NCG01559 and Agreement Numbers NPPI1011456 and NPPI09112456 are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/25/2016. (jak)
|
March 28, 2016 |
Filing
57
ORDER suspending the 26 Final Scheduling Order and cancelling the 6 June 2016 trial. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue if the Court's view changes after a deeper look into the papers. The Court defers ruling on the parties' discovery dispute, 55 . If a trial is needed, the Court will address the helpful joint report. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/28/2016. (jak)
|
February 22, 2016 |
Filing
44
ORDER denying 38 Motion for Sanctions; denying 39 Motion to Strike. The Court amends the Final Scheduling Order and sets the following deadlines: 26 February 2016 - Underwriters must provide any other non-privileged Gray material about the insurance claim, including internal email. 29 February 2016 - Hudson must allow Underwriters to inspect the marina. 4 March 2016 - Hudson must decide if it will hire an expert, and notify Underwriters. 31 March 2016 - Hudson must provide any expert report. If Hudson hires an expert, Underwriters may depose that person outside the discovery period. The Final Scheduling Order, 26 , otherwise remains in effect. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/22/2016. (jak)
|
May 29, 2015 |
Filing
19
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 and 15 Motions to Dismiss. All of Ray and Debra Hudson's claims are dismissed without prejudice, and they're dismissed as parties, for lack of standing, which undermines subject matter jurisd iction. For various reasons, all of Hudson Enterprises's claims against Certain Underwriters - except its breach-of-contract claims - are dismissed with prejudice. All of Hudson Enterprises's claims against Risk Placement - except the unjus t enrichment claim - are dismissed with prejudice. The unjust enrichment claims is dismissed without prejudice. Hudson Enterprises's embedded motion to amend for a third time, 17 , is denied. With one exception, any amendment would be futile. The exception is the potential unjust enrichment claim against Risk Placement, which can be addressed in due course. Case stayed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/29/2015. (jak)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?