Panhandle Oil and Gas Inc v. BP America Production Company

Plaintiff: Panhandle Oil and Gas Inc
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv00030
Filed: January 14, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/4/2017. (jak)
July 22, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion. The Amended Final Scheduling Order, 14 , is suspended. A new scheduling order with a new trial date will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/22/2016. (jak)
December 3, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Report, 12 , noted and appreciated. The embedded request to continue the May trial is granted. The Final Scheduling Order, 11 , is suspended. An Amended Final Scheduling Order with new deadlines will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/3/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panhandle Oil and Gas Inc v. BP America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panhandle Oil and Gas Inc
Represented By: M. Edward Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Represented By: Leslie L. Lynch
Represented By: Rob F. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?