Rhea Drugstore Inc v. Prodigy Diabetes Care LLC

Plaintiff: Rhea Drugstore Inc
Defendant: Prodigy Diabetes Care LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv00054
Filed: January 23, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:521
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice based on the parties' stipulation. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/27/2015. (jak)
May 14, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Rhea Drugstore's motion for class certificate, 2 , is denied without prejudice. Prodigy's motion to stay based on its FCC petition, 15 , is denied. The case will proceed on a claim, and as potential class action, about the contents of unsolicited faxes. A Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/14/2015. (jak)
February 24, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court received the attached letters from counsel yesterday. Requests for relief should be made by motion on the docket. Construing the letter from Prodigy's lawyer as a motion to extend, the Court denies the request without prejudice. Prodigy may be in default. But that issue, too, needs fleshing out on a brief motion. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/24/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhea Drugstore Inc v. Prodigy Diabetes Care LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhea Drugstore Inc
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: James Allen Carney, Jr.
Represented By: John Charles Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodigy Diabetes Care LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?