Henry v. Holiday et al

Plaintiff: Roy Henry, Jr
Defendant: Doc Holiday, Carl L Johnson, Ed Stafford and Does
Case Number: 4:2015cv00140
Filed: March 10, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 61 Order filed on this date, and the order entered in this matter on 4/12/2016, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/3/2016. (mef)
April 12, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition submitted by United States Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris 42 ; defendant Carl L. Johnson's motion for summary judgment and his motion to adopt are granted 31 36 ; plaintiff's claims against Johnson are dismissed without prejudice; defendant Charles Holladay's motion for summary judgment 33 is granted and plaintiff's claims against Holladay are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/12/16. (tjb)
April 10, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to provide an address at which Defendant Johnson may be served. Plaintiff's failure to do so within 30 days may result in the recommended dismissal of his claims against Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 4/10/2015. (ks)
April 9, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND PARTIAL RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects and dismissing Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility and Prosecutor/District Attorney of Pulaski County. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 04/09/2015. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Holiday et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Henry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holiday
Represented By: David M. Fuqua
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Represented By: Patrick L. Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?