Miller v. Callahan et al

Plaintiff: Steven Miller
Defendant: Austin Callahan, Larry Barbee, Doc Holiday and Randy Morgan
Case Number: 4:2015cv00311
Filed: June 1, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 69 order entered earlier today, judgment for Defendants Austin Callahan, Larry Barbee, Charles "Doc" Holladay, and Randy Morgan against Plaintiff Steven Miller is hereby entered. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/01/2016. (rhm)
August 4, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of Defendant Charles "Doc" Holladay, as set forth in his 23 answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 8/4/2015. (ks)
July 27, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a summons for Barbee and Callahan and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint, 1 , this order, and summons upon them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Service should be attempted at the Pulaski County Detention Facility Administration Office, 3201 West Roosevelt Road, Little Rock, AR 72204, attention Lesa Warner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 7/27/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Callahan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Barbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holiday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?