Helena Chemical Company v. Emmet Torian et al

Plaintiff: Helena Chemical Company
Defendant: Emmet Torian and Emmet Torian Farms
Case Number: 4:2015cv00324
Filed: June 5, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The 48 and 49 Motions to dismiss garnishee's Centennial Bank and Regions Bank are granted. 32 & 35 Motions to quash the writs of garnishment are denied as moot. The 46 Motion to dismiss the writs of garnishment to Christopher Schaefers and James Schaefers, operating as Schaefers Brothers Farm is granted. These dismissals are without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/1/2017. (jak)
October 16, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: On the lock box at Regions Bank: drill it, at Helena Chemical's expense, in the presence of representatives of Torian and Helena Chemical. Helena Chemical is entitled anything of value in the lock box, but is not entitled to use the Writ to do discovery. On the Centennial Bank account: Torian must provide Helena Chemical copies of records showing the funds' source. Joint report due by 10/31/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/16/2017. (jak)
June 21, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 17 Motion for Attorney Fees. Torian owes Helena $15,839 for reasonable attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/21/2016. (jak)
May 9, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT for Helena Chemical Company against Emmet Torian and Emmet Torian Farms,jointly and severally, for $147,555.15 in principal and $45,025.76 in prejudgment finance charges, plus a reasonable attorney's fee and costs as the Court may later award on timely motion. Post judgment interest will accrue at 0.58% per annum from today until this Judgment is paid in full. 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a)-(b). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/9/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helena Chemical Company v. Emmet Torian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Chemical Company
Represented By: Roger D. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmet Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmet Torian Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?