Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. All Seasons Roofing Inc et al

Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: All Seasons Roofing Inc and Brownlee Construction Consultants LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv00412
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: All claims against All Seasons Roofing are dismissed with prejudice. All claims against Brownlee Construction Consultants are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/19/2016. (jak)
September 9, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/9/2016. (jak)
September 15, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice all claims against Brownlee Construction Consultants LLC. The Court directs the Clerk to update the docket to reflect this change. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/15/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. All Seasons Roofing Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Robert William Cockerham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Seasons Roofing Inc
Represented By: Jonathan E. Baker
Represented By: Michael J. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownlee Construction Consultants LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?