Skrable v. Stodola et al

Plaintiff: Luke Skrable
Defendant: Mark Stodola
Case Number: 4:2015cv00497
Filed: August 7, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 92 Order that was entered on this day, judgment is entered in favor of Defendants Mark Stodola, Bruce Moore and the City of Little Rock and against Plaintiff Luke Skrable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/25/2017. (mef)
January 11, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss and 13 Motion to Dismiss. Mayor Stodola's motion to dismiss 7 is granted on the banning-letter claim and denied without prejudice on the claim about the City board meeting. Man ager Moore's motion to dismiss 13 is granted on the First Amendment claim and denied without prejudice on the Fourteenth Amendment claim. The First Amendment claim against Mayor Stodola based on the City board meeting and the Fourteenth Amendment claim against Manager Moore asserting denial of equal protection based on the banning letter remain. The Court will issue an Initial Scheduling Order and proposed Final Scheduling Order now. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/11/2016. (jak)
September 17, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Moore. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons, the complaint, 2 , the amended complaint, 4 , and this Order on Moore without prepayment of fees and costs or security. The Court directs Skrable to familiarize himself with this Court's Local Rules. Any future proposed amended complaint must be complete. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/17/2015. (jak)
August 20, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Skrable's claims against Carpenter are dismissed without prejudice. Skrable hasn't stated a claim against Bruce T. Moore. He is therefore dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons for Mayor Stodola and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, and this Order on Mayor Stodola without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/20/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skrable v. Stodola et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Skrable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stodola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?