Tuohey v. Chenal Healthcare LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brenda Tuohey
Defendant: Chenal Healthcare LLC, LaVie Care Centers LLC, CMC II LLC, Centennial Healthcare Corporation, Centennial Healthcare Management Corporation, Centennial Healthcare Investment Corporation, Shoreline Healthcare Management LLC, Coastal Administrative Services LLC, Centennial Healthcare Holding Company LLC, Centennial Healthcare Properties LLC, Centennial Newco Holding Company LLC, ALG LaVie LLC, FC Investors XXI LLC, LV Investment LLC, LV Operations I LLC, LV Operations II LLC, Hilltopper Holding Corp, MCP LaVie LLC, Say La Vie LLC, Senior Care LaVie LLC, Diamond Senior Living LLC, Centennial Master Tenant LLC and Ralph Johnson
Case Number: 4:2015cv00506
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2017 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/7/2017. (ljb)
May 17, 2017 124 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part the defendants' 89 motion for summary judgment; granting Diamond Senior Living, LLC's 92 motion for summary judgment; and granting the non-facility defendants' 95 motion for summary judgment. The claims against all of the defendants except Chenal Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/17/2017. (ljb)
March 25, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' 42 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The amended complaint states a claim against the Center in Count II for breach of contract based on the admission agreement. Count II fails to state a claim against the remaining defendants and is dismissed without prejudice. Counts I, III, V, and VI fail to state a claim and are dismissed without prejudice. Because the Court is dismissing Count I, Diamond Senior Living, LLC's separate partial motion to dismiss 58 is moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/25/2016. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuohey v. Chenal Healthcare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Tuohey
Represented By: Howard Gregory Campbell
Represented By: Robert William Francis
Represented By: Brent Lee Moss
Represented By: Brian David Reddick
Represented By: Joshua C. Rovelli
Represented By: Matthew David Swindle
Represented By: Daniel K. Yim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chenal Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaVie Care Centers LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC II LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Healthcare Management Corporation
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Healthcare Investment Corporation
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoreline Healthcare Management LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Administrative Services LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Healthcare Holding Company LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Healthcare Properties LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Newco Holding Company LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALG LaVie LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FC Investors XXI LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV Investment LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV Operations I LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV Operations II LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilltopper Holding Corp
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCP LaVie LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Say La Vie LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Care LaVie LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Senior Living LLC
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fletcher
Represented By: Samantha Leflar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Master Tenant LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Johnson
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?