Downing v. Department of Finance and Administration et al
Plaintiff: William R Downing, Jr
Defendant: Department of Finance and Administration, Bob Haugen and David Justice
Case Number: 4:2015cv00570
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 825
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 JUDGMENT: Downing's amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice based on the parties' settlement during the trial. The Court retains jurisdiction until 6/5/2018 to resolve any disputes about the settlement. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/5/2018. (jak)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: The Court will hold another pretrial at 10:00 a.m. Monday, 4/2/2018 to discuss the final exhibits and law issues, as needed. Voir dire will begin at 1:00 p.m. 91 Motion is denied with caveats. 99 Motion is granted in part and denied in par t. The Court is attaching its working drafts of the voir dire, the preliminary instructions, the final instructions, the questions/verdict, and the Rehab Act damages instruction and question. If the parties would prefer to have the Court ask certain questions to the jurors, please submit them to chambers for consideration by close of business on 3/30/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/29/2018. (jak)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: The Court much appreciates the parties' endorsement of the definitions/questions procedure, as well as their comments, objections, and suggestions on the particulars. Attachment one is a responding redline showing the changes the Court is inclined to make and Attachment two is a clean version. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/28/2018. (jak)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: Downing's 39 Motion for summary judgment is denied. Defendants' 35 Motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' supplemental 64 motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The claims for trial are as follows: FMLA failure to reinstate; ADA/Rehab Act discrimination; ADA/Rehab Act accommodation; and Rehab Act retaliation. The Department's 58 motion in limine is granted in part and denied in part. An Amended Final Scheduling Order with a first-out trial setting will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/20/2017. (jak)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER suspending the 30 Amended Final Scheduling Order and cancelling the March 7 trial. 69 Motion to strike is denied without prejudice. Downing should respond to the belated summary judgment motion, 64 , on both procedural and merits grounds by 3/3/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/14/2017. (jak)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion. Downing's ACRA claim is dismissed without prejudice. The case goes forward on the other claims listed in the chart on page two. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/2016. (jak)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Downing's timely amended complaint moots defendants' motion to dismiss the original complaint. Defendants' motion, 3 , is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/30/2015. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downing v. Department of Finance and Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Downing, Jr
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Finance and Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Haugen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?