Doe et al v. Arkansas Department of Education et al

Plaintiff: Lakesha Doe, Dennis Doe, Claudius Johnson, Christian Doe, Evelyn Doe, Edward Doe, Candice Doe, James Doe, Jade Doe, Sonya Doe, Johnny Doe, Joy C Springer and Jim Ross
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Education, Toyce Newton, Jay Barth, Joe Black, Susan Chambers, Charisse Dean, Mireya Reith, Vickie Saviers, R Brett Williamson, Diane Zook, Johnny Key and Baker Kurrus
Case Number: 4:2015cv00623
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2017 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 99 & 102 Motions. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/9/2017. (jak)
January 30, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 106 Motion to Stay with a caveat. The caveat: All the notices of deposition are quashed; the parties must reschedule the depositions on mutually convenient dates. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/30/2017. (jak)
January 23, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 Motion to Clarify. Johnny Key, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Education, is a defendant only to the extent that he has exercised (and is exercising) "all authority of the [LRSD] board of directors as may be necessary for the day-to-day governance of the school district". Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/2017. (jak)
November 3, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: To complete the record, the Court attaches to this Order all the letters mentioned in docket entry 85 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/3/2016. (jak)
October 5, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Motion. The Court confirms that Michael Poore, in his official capacity as Superintendent of the Little Rock School District, has been substituted for Baker Kurrus. The Court's recent 72 Order ended the case as to Defendant s Arkansas Department of Education, Jay Barth, Joe Black, Susan Chambers, Charisse Dean, Mireya Reith, R. Brett Williamson, Diane Zook, Johnny Key, Fitz Hill, and Ouida Newton. The Clerk should update the docket to reflect all these changes. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/5/2016. (jak)
September 28, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's First Amendment, Thirteenth Amendment, Fourteenth Amendment, Fifteenth Amendment, and conspiracy claims against the State Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/28/2016. (jak)
July 15, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 MOTION to Substitute Party. Fitz Hill and Ouida Newton are substituted for Toyce Newton and Vicki Savers. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/15/2016. (jak)
March 24, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the end of the hearing, 56 & 57 , plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, 28 , is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/24/2016. (jak)
March 21, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Counsel for the parties may bring their cell phones (including smart phones) into the Courthouse for the March 22 and 23 hearing. And any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/21/2016. (jak)
March 18, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order without prejudice as premature. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/18/2016. (jak)
February 17, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction due 29 February 2016. The parties should exchange witness lists, and exhibits, by noon on 2 March 2016. Please deliver copies to the Court then, too. Court will convene at 9:00 a.m. on 3 March 2016 in Courtroom 1A. Plaintiffs must complete their argument and proof that day. Defendants may present their argument and proof on 4 March 2016. They will also have one day. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/17/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Arkansas Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakesha Doe
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Doe
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudius Johnson
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Doe
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Doe
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Doe
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Doe
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Doe
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jade Doe
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Doe
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Doe
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy C Springer
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Ross
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Peter Pressman
Represented By: Gale Booth Stewart
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyce Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Barth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charisse Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mireya Reith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Saviers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Brett Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Zook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Kurrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?