Greenwell et al v. Howard Group et al

Plaintiff: Paige Greenwell and Zachary Fluker
Defendant: Howard Group, R Wings R Wild LLC and Conway Wild Wings LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv00742
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2017 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court appreciates the parties' joint report, 102 . All material things considered, the Defendants have made a sufficient, albeit unsuccessful, effort to get the data in the format Greenwell and Fluker want. FED. R. CIV. P. 26(b)(l). Plaintiffs are free to pursue targeted third-party discovery about the time-lapse data-at plaintiffs' own expense. But the Court encourages everyone to make do with what's in hand. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/12/2017. (jak)
January 24, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint reports 74 , 76 & 79 , noted. The Court will hold a ninety-minute hearing on these issues at 9:00 a.m. on 2/10/2017 in Courtroom B155 of the Richard S. Arnold Courthouse in Little Rock. The other mentioned discovery disputes should be presented in one more joint report by 1/31/2017. No depositions until after the hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/24/2017. (jak)
July 7, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER conditionally certifying a collective action. The group includes current and former servers and bartenders at Buffalo Wild Wing restaurants owned by Jeromy Howard in Arkansas and Oklahoma. The Court approves the notice as proposed, 37 . Defend ants must provide plaintiffs with a list of possible collective-action members in a usable electronic format by 7/22/2016. The list must include each person's name, last known address, dates of employment, and employer ID number. The opt-in period will close 9/15/2016. Motion 36 mostly granted and partly denied. Motion, 30 , denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/7/2016. (jak)
May 9, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court applauds the parties' seeming agreement, 30 ; but the Court must make an independent Judgment. Motion for conditional certification due by 23 May 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/9/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenwell et al v. Howard Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Greenwell
Represented By: Zachary C. Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M. Werman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Fluker
Represented By: Zachary C. Flowerree
Represented By: Douglas M. Werman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Group
Represented By: Jay M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Wings R Wild LLC
Represented By: Jay M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway Wild Wings LLC
Represented By: Jay M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?