Planned Parenthood Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma et al v. Jegley et al
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma and Stephanie Ho
Defendant: Larry Jegley and Matt Durrett
Case Number: 4:2015cv00784
Filed: December 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/27/2019. (jbh)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER granting 116 plaintiffs' second motion for preliminary injunction. This preliminary injunction remains in effect until further order from this Court. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/2/2018. (thd)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting 84 PPAEO and Dr. Ho's motion for temporary restraining order. This temporary restraining order shall expire by its own terms on Monday, 7/2/2018 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/18/2018. (thd)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Wright will recuse due to senior status. The Court directs the Clerk to assign this action to another Judge. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/28/2015. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planned Parenthood Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma et al v. Jegley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Melissa A. Cohen
Represented By: Helen Krasnoff
Represented By: Maithreyi Ratakonda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Ho
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Helen Krasnoff
Represented By: Maithreyi Ratakonda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Jegley
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Represented By: Colin R. Jorgensen
Represented By: Mindy D. Pipkin
Represented By: Lee Rudofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Durrett
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Represented By: Colin R. Jorgensen
Represented By: Mindy D. Pipkin
Represented By: Lee Rudofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?