Baker & Taylor Inc v. Griffin et al

Plaintiff: Baker & Taylor Inc
Defendant: David Griffin, Charles Jones and College Book Rental Company LLC
Case Number: 4:2015mc00006
Filed: March 4, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2015 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Motions 189 , 192 , & 197 , denied without prejudice based on the Baker & Taylor/Griffin settlement. See Order No. 42 in the related case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/28/2015. (jak)
October 21, 2015 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated at the end of the 21 October 2015 hearing, the Court overrules David and Roxie Griffin's objections, 93 & 95 . Southern Bancorp Bank must pay the balance of the checking account to Baker & Taylor forthwith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/21/2015. (jak)
September 1, 2015 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 182 Motion to Intervene. Metropolitan's unopposed motion to file documents under seal, 184 , is granted. Please send a courtesy paper copy to chambers. Baker & Taylor's motion to file an unredacted motion for attachment and charging order under seal, 191 , is granted. Please also send a courtesy paper copy to chambers of this filing too. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/1/2015. (jak)
July 29, 2015 177 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/29/2015. (jak)
June 10, 2015 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The garnishment lien on five of the six Southern Bancorp Bank accounts involving David Griffin is released. It is released by agreement on account nos. XXX5227, XXX6991, and XXX4950. It is released on account nos. XXX7551 and XXX5009 because i t's undisputed that Griffin is only a signatory on those accounts and has no ownership interest in them. The Court authorizes Baker & Taylor, at its choice, to take a two-hour deposition of Roxie Griffin, at a mutually convenient date, time, and place. The deposition is limited solely to the one remaining Southern Bancorp account, where ownership is disputed. The parties shall file briefs and list witnesses and exhibits on 30 July 2015. The Court will hold a hearing on 12 August 2014 at 9:00 a.m., if need be. Tyler Mathis Griffin Trust and Griffin Irrevocable Trust One, whose interests in this matter have now been resolved, are dismissed as parties. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/10/2015. (jak)
May 19, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court notes Baker & Taylor's motion, 89 , and requests a supplement. Please give the Court more information about David McCreery's qualifications. Some information about McCreery's experience would also be helpful. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/19/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker & Taylor Inc v. Griffin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baker & Taylor Inc
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Lance R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College Book Rental Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?