ICM of America Inc v. Leica Geosystems Inc et al

Plaintiff: ICM of America Inc
Defendant: Leica Geosystems Inc, David Rowlett, Hexagon AB, Ken Mooyman, Stribling Equipment LLC, Gerald Swanson and John Does
Case Number: 4:2016cv00160
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants and dismissing this action in its entirety. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/9/2017. (mef)
December 2, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 62 motion; dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's claims against separate defendant Gerald Swanson; and dismissing separate defendant Swanson as a party to this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/2/2016. (mef)
July 26, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Defendant Leica Geosystems, Inc.'s motion to dismiss and denying 48 Defendant Jerry Swanson's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/26/2016. (mef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ICM of America Inc v. Leica Geosystems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ICM of America Inc
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leica Geosystems Inc
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: John M. Bowler
Represented By: Lindsay Mitchell Henner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rowlett
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: John M. Bowler
Represented By: Lindsay Mitchell Henner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hexagon AB
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: John M. Bowler
Represented By: Lindsay Mitchell Henner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Mooyman
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: John M. Bowler
Represented By: Lindsay Mitchell Henner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stribling Equipment LLC
Represented By: Madeline Kurrus Moore
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Daniel Warren Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Swanson
Represented By: Madeline Kurrus Moore
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Daniel Warren Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?