Reaves et al v. Transport Corporation of America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Altha Reaves and Mayonna Bizzell
Defendant: Transport Corporation of America Inc and Jimmie Martin Harper, Jr
Case Number: 4:2016cv00376
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice, pursuant to the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/20/2017. (ljb)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 OPINION AND ORDER granting the defendants' 57 motion for partial summary judgment; and denying Transport Corporation's 62 motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/4/2017. (ljb)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER denying the 5 motion to remand. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/4/2016. (ljb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaves et al v. Transport Corporation of America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altha Reaves
Represented By: Kevin Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayonna Bizzell
Represented By: Kevin Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Corporation of America Inc
Represented By: Kara B. Mikles
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie Martin Harper, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?