Salley v. ABC Financial Services Inc

Plaintiff: Rachel Salley
Defendant: ABC Financial Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2016cv00542
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Notice of pending settlement 28 appreciated. Congratulations. The 7 Final Scheduling Order is suspended, and the 2/5/2018 trial is canceled. The parties are directed to file a joint motion, with the proposed agreement attached, by 10/18/20 17. The terms must be public. If there's a lawyer's fee involved, also file the billing records; either redact any privileged information, or file them under seal if redaction is impracticable. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2017. (jak)
September 6, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Withdraw. Counsel must, as soon as practicable, copy their entire file and send it to Salley. Counsel must also file notice with the Court reflecting that this has been done and providing the Court with all of Salley� 39;s contact information. Notice due by 9/8/2017. By 9/18/2017 Salley must file a paper with the Court covering two points. First, she must explain why she did not comply with the Court's Order and attend the 9/6/2017 hearing. Second, she must inform the Court whether she intends to proceed pro se or hire a new lawyer. If Salley wants to hire a new lawyer, she must do so, and that lawyer must appear by 9/29/2017. The Court directs Salley's former lawyers to send her a copy of this Order with the file, as well as by e-mail. The Court also directs the Clerk to send another copy of this Order directly to Salley when the contact information is available. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/6/2017. (jak)
August 8, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court notes and appreciates the 18 joint status report. The Court will extend the discovery and motions deadlines by approximately one month so the parties can respond to this Order. Discovery is extended to 9/5/2017 and Motions due by 9 /29/2017. The 11 Motion for conditional certification is denied without prejudice to another one - if she can provide some confirming evidence of a widespread situation that affected many ABC employees. If Sally renews her request for a group action, she should file a pointed supplemental motion. ABC would likewise file a pointed supplemental response. The Court will consider the many papers filed the first time around. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/8/2017. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salley v. ABC Financial Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Salley
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Financial Services Inc
Represented By: Dylan Hugh Potts
Represented By: Danielle M. Whitehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?