Stovall v. Mack Trucks Inc et al
Plaintiff: Burris Richard Stovall
Defendant: Mack Trucks Inc, Volvo Group North America LLC and John Does
Case Number: 4:2016cv00713
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER denying 255 motion to exclude the testimony of Sri Kumar; denying 284 motion to exclude the testimony of Michelle Vogler; denying 286 motion to exclude the testimony of James Funk; denying 256 motion for summary judgment; taking 275 supplemental motion to compel under advisement; and granting 288 motion for continuance. An amended final scheduling order will be entered. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/18/2022. (ldb)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting to the extent stated on the record 230 Motion to Compel, Motion for Assistance with Discovery and Motion for Sanctions; denying for the reasons stated on the record 237 Motion to Compel Production; granting 254 Motion to Take the Deposition of Meghan Tadlock; and granting 263 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Time to respond to 255 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Sri Kumar and 256 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/14/2022. (ldb)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER: The claims of Burris Richard Stovall, Administrator of the Estate of Richard Joshua Stovall, Deceased, against only Indiana Mills & Manufacturing, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs claims against all other defendants shall continue. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/10/2022. (jbh)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 OPINION AND ORDER granting 113 Burris Richard Stovall's motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/9/2018. (kdr) (Docket text modified on 5/9/2018 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 OPINION AND ORDER denying 68 Mack Trucks' partial motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/12/2018. (ljb)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 and 33 motions for protective order; and denying 51 motion to compel and to revise the schedule. The Court assumes that documents will be produced forthwith and that the parties can schedule depositions accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/16/2017. (ljb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stovall v. Mack Trucks Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burris Richard Stovall
Represented By: J. Ray Baxter
Represented By: Clyde Tab Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks Inc
Represented By: Michael J. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Group North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?