Patillo v. Sysco Arkansas
Plaintiff: Patillo and Lateshia Patillo
Defendant: Sysco Foods of Arkansas LLC and Sysco Arkansas
Case Number: 4:2016cv00722
Filed: October 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 125 MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the opinion and judgment of 02/24/2020 as to #116 Notice of Appeal and #118 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Lateshia Patillo. (ajt)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER of USCA as to #116 Notice of Appeal and #118 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Lateshia Patillo: The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. The petition for rehearing by the panel is also denied. (ajt)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER of USCA as to #116 Notice of Appeal and #118 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Lateshia Patillo: The mandate issued 03/16/2020 us hereby recalled. (ajt)
March 16, 2020 Filing 122 MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the opinion and judgment of 02/24/2020 as to #116 Notice of Appeal and #118 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Lateshia Patillo. [RECALLED pursuant to #123 USCA Order.] (ajt)
February 24, 2020 Filing 121 USCA JUDGMENT as to #116 Notice of Appeal and #118 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Lateshia Patillo: It is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court. (ajt)
February 24, 2020 Filing 120 OPINION of USCA as to #116 Notice of Appeal and #118 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Lateshia Patillo. (ajt)
June 12, 2019 Filing 119 USCA Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule as to #116 Notice of Appeal and #118 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Lateshia Patillo. USCA Case Number 19-2203. (cmn)
June 7, 2019 Filing 118 Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #113 Opinion and Order and #114 Judgment by Lateshia Patillo. (cmn)
June 6, 2019 Filing 117 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #116 Notice of Appeal re #113 Opinion and Order and #114 Judgment. (cmn)
June 6, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #113 Opinion and Order and #114 Judgment by Lateshia Patillo. (cmn)
May 7, 2019 Filing 115 RESPONSE and Memorandum to #110 MOTION to Continue filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #113 Opinion and Order entered separately today, judgment is entered in favor of Sysco Arkansas, a Division of Sysco USA II, LLC, on the claims of Lateshia Patillo. The complaint of Lateshia Patillo is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/7/2019. (ljb)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 OPINION AND ORDER granting #92 Sysco Arkansas's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/7/2019. (ljb)
May 7, 2019 Filing 112 SUR-REPLY in Opposition to #92 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL DEADLINES and granting #110 Defendant's Motion. All pretrial deadlines contained in #59 Amended Scheduling Order are hereby continued pending resolution of #92 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and #83 Motion to Dismiss. The Court will reset these deadlines if necessary. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/6/2019. (ljb)
May 2, 2019 Filing 110 MOTION to Continue Pretrial Deadlines by Sysco Arkansas (Attachments: #1 Document proposed Order)(Duffy, Dennis)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #107 Lateshia Patillo's motion to strike defendant's response to her reply to the motion for summary judgment or in the alternative for permission to file a surreply. The request to strike the response is denied. The alternative request for permission to file a surreply is granted. The surreply must be filed on or before 5/6/2019. Patillo's #108 motion to strike the defendant's response regarding the motion to dismiss or for sanctions is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/1/2019. (ljb)
April 30, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION to Strike #106 Reply to Response to #83 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Compel Sanctions for Failure of Certification of Service, for Failure to Respond in a Timely Manner, from the In-Person View of Electronic Filing of Docket Report filed by Lateshia Patillo.(fjg)
April 30, 2019 Filing 107 MOTION to Strike #105 Reply to Response to #92 Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief the Alternative Plaintiff MOTION for Extension of Time to Seek Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support as a Result of In-Person View of Docket Proceedings filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
April 25, 2019 Filing 106 REPLY to Response to Motion re #83 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel, for Sanctions, and for Extension of Time Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Sysco Arkansas. (Duffy, Dennis)
April 25, 2019 Filing 105 REPLY to Response to Motion re #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sysco Arkansas. (Duffy, Dennis)
April 22, 2019 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition to #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support & Motion to Strike Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, Brief in Support, Exhibits and Affidavits filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
April 22, 2019 Filing 103 RESPONSE to #83 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Lateshia Patillo's emergency motion for extension of time to respond to the defendant's status report, motion for summary judgment, and brief in support. The time within which Patillo must respond is extended up to and including 4/22/2019. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/22/2019. (ljb)
April 19, 2019 Filing 101 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time Due to Plaintiff's Illness filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying #96 motion for recusal. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/17/2019. (ljb)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #97 and #98 motions. The time within which Lateshia Patillo must respond to the motion to dismiss, respond to the motion for summary judgment, and file a status report is extended up to and including 4/19/2019. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/17/2019. (ljb)
April 16, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
April 16, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #94 Status Report, #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #93 Brief in Support, filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
April 16, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION for Recusal of Judge Leon Holmes filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying #89 motion for interlocutory appeal and for a stay. Lateshia Patillo must respond to #83 motion to dismiss or in the alternative to compel, for sanctions, and for extension of time, on or before 4/14/2019. April 14, 2019 is also the deadline for filing a response to the defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/1/2019. (ljb)
March 29, 2019 Filing 94 STATUS REPORT by Sysco Arkansas. (Duffy, Dennis)
March 29, 2019 Filing 93 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #92 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sysco Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Duffy, Dennis)
March 29, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sysco Arkansas (Attachments: #1 Document Statement of Material Facts)(Duffy, Dennis)
March 27, 2019 Filing 91 USCA MANDATE issued in accordance with the judgment.(cmn)
March 27, 2019 Filing 90 USCA JUDGMENT denying the petition for writ of mandamus.(cmn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION for Interlocutory Appeal and MOTION to Stay by Lateshia Patillo. (cmn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM re #83 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel, for Sanctions, and for Extension of Time filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
March 25, 2019 Filing 87 USCA Docketing Letter. Petition for Writ of Mandamus has been filed and assigned case number 19-1606. (cmn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Errata Sheet for Transcript of Testimony of Lateshia Patillo by Lateshia Patillo (jap)
March 14, 2019 Filing 84 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #83 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel, for Sanctions, and for Extension of Time filed by Sysco Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Buller, Joseph)
March 14, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel, for Sanctions, and for Extension of Time by Sysco Arkansas (Buller, Joseph)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying #81 Lateshia Patillo's motion to modify, extend, or enforce protective order and motion for reconsideration of plaintiff's protective order and for automatic stay. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/14/2019. (ljb)
March 13, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION to Modify, Extend, or Enforce Protective Order and (), MOTION for Reconsideration of Plaintiff's Protective Order and for Automatic Stay on Proceedings by Lateshia Patillo (jap)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #66 and #71 Patillo's motion for protective order; and granting in part and denying in part #69 defendant's motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to compel, for sanctions, and for extension of time. The request for extending the deadlines is denied without prejudice to the right of Sysco to renew that motion if it becomes necessary. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/1/2019. (ljb)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying #64 Lateshia Patillo's motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/1/2019. (ljb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 Motion for Protective Order filed by Sysco Arkansas. (Buller, Joseph)
February 27, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE to Motion re #66 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Sysco Arkansas. (Buller, Joseph)
February 19, 2019 Filing 76 REPLY to Response in Opposition to #66 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 75 REPLY to Response In Opposition to #64 MOTION for Reconsideration of Partially Summary Judgments filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE to #67 Notice of Appearance by Lateshia Patillo. (llg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 73 ADDENDUM to #71 Addendum filed by Lateshia Patillo. (llg)
February 19, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #71 Addendum/Motion. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the filing event. (jak)
February 15, 2019 Filing 72 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #68 Response to Motion, #70 Brief in Support, #69 Motion lack an original signature (F.R.Cv.P.11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak)
February 15, 2019 Filing 71 ADDENDUM/MOTION by Lateshia Patillo (jap)(Docket entry modified on 2/19/2019 to correct the filing event)(jak)
February 14, 2019 Filing 85 VIDEO filed by Sysco Arkansas re #70 Brief in Support. [maintained in the Clerk's Office file] (jap)
February 14, 2019 Filing 70 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of its #69 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel, for Sanctions and for Extension of Time filed by Sysco Arkansas.(jap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
February 14, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Compel, for Sanctions and for Extension of Time () by Sysco Arkansas (jap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
February 14, 2019 Filing 68 RESPONSE to Motion re #64 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Sysco Arkansas. (jap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
February 14, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Richard Buller, III on behalf of Sysco Arkansas (Buller, Joseph)
February 13, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Protective Order by Lateshia Patillo (jap)
February 6, 2019 Filing 65 Procedural OBJECTION to Defendant's Notice of Intent to take the Oral Deposition filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for Reconsideration re #43 of Partially Summary Judgments filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lateshia Patillo. (cmn)
January 4, 2019 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lateshia Patillo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jones, Daveante)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #57 defendant's motion to withdraw Kelline Linton as counsel for the defendant in this action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/3/2019. (ljb)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #56 Daveante Jones's motion to withdraw as counsel for Lateshia Patillo. The Court declines Patillo's request for appointment of a new lawyer. Within 14 days of entry of this Order Patillo must provide an address and telephone number that the Court and opposing counsel may use to communicate with her or she must retain a lawyer and have that lawyer enter an appearance. The Court orders Jones to serve a copy of this Order on Patillo and file a certificate of service. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/3/2019. (ljb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 59 AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial reset for the week of 5/28/2019 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge J. Leon Holmes. Discovery due by 3/15/2019. Motions due by 3/29/2019. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/7/2019. Status Report due by 3/29/2019. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/2/2019. (cdw)
December 31, 2018 Filing 58 PRO SE RESPONSE to #56 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Lateshia Patillo. (llg)
December 27, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelline Linton by Sysco Arkansas (Duffy, Dennis)
December 27, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lateshia Patillo (Jones, Daveante)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 joint motion to amend scheduling order. The present scheduling order is hereby set aside and this case is removed from the trial docket for the week of 4/8/2019. A new scheduling order with a new trial date will be entered separately. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/19/2018. (ljb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #52 Scheduling Order, by Sysco Arkansas (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Order)(Duffy, Dennis)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/28/2018. (ljb)
July 24, 2018 Filing 52 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 4/8/2019 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge J. Leon Holmes. Discovery due by 1/24/2019. Motions due by 2/7/2019. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 3/18/2019. Status Report due by 2/7/2019. Signed at the direction of the Court. (cdw)
July 23, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #51 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #50 Amended Complaint. (jak)
July 20, 2018 Filing 51 ANSWER to #50 First Amended Complaint by Sysco Arkansas.(Duffy, Dennis)(Docket text modified on 7/23/2018 to establish linkage) (jak)
July 6, 2018 Filing 50 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sysco Arkansas, filed by Lateshia Patillo(Jones, Daveante) (Docket text modified on 7/6/2018 to correct Defendant's name.) (thd).
July 6, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #50 First Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document is filed against Defendant Sysco Arkansas. (thd)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part #39 Patillo's motion to amend her complaint; setting aside the judgment dismissing her action with prejudice; reopening the case; and granting in part and denying in part #45 Patillo's motion for reconsideration. Patillo will be permitted to file an amended complaint alleging racial discrimination in being denied a promotion and racial discrimination and retaliation for having her hours reduced, all under 42 U.S.C. 1981. Otherwise, her motion is denied. Patillo must file an amended complaint within 14 days from the entry of this Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/5/2018. (ljb)
July 3, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #48 Reply to Response to Motion. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak)
July 2, 2018 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Lateshia Patillo. (Jones, Daveante) (Docket text modified on 7/3/2018 to remove duplicate text)(jak)
June 25, 2018 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration filed by Sysco Foods of Arkansas LLC. (Duffy, Dennis)
June 11, 2018 Filing 46 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #45 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Lateshia Patillo. (Jones, Daveante)
June 11, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by Lateshia Patillo (Jones, Daveante)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #43 Opinion and Order entered separately today, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/1/2018. (ljb)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION AND ORDER denying #39 Lateshia Patillo's motion for leave to file an amended complaint; again granting #15 Sysco Foods of Arkansas, LLC's motion to dismiss; and dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/1/2018. (ljb)
May 17, 2018 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Lateshia Patillo. (Jones, Daveante)
May 14, 2018 Filing 41 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #32 Brief (non-appeal), Addressing Issues on Remand filed by Sysco Foods of Arkansas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Duffy, Dennis)
May 10, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Sysco Foods of Arkansas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Duffy, Dennis)
April 26, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Lateshia Patillo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jones, Daveante)
April 26, 2018 Filing 38 BRIEF filed by Lateshia Patillo Plaintiff's Response Brief Addressing Issues on Remand (Jones, Daveante)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER lifting the stay in this action. Patillo's brief regarding the issues on remand from the Eighth Circuit will be due on or before 6/7/2018. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/26/2018. (ljb)
April 20, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE by Lateshia Patillo Notice of Decision in Bankruptcy Proceeding (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jones, Daveante)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Lateshia Patillo's motion for stay. This action is hereby stayed pending entry of an order by the bankruptcy court authorizing the plaintiff to proceed and approving retention of counsel. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/13/2018. (ljb)
February 13, 2018 Filing 34 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #33 Motion to Stay filed by Lateshia Patillo. (Jones, Daveante)
February 13, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Stay by Lateshia Patillo (Jones, Daveante)
February 12, 2018 Filing 32 BRIEF filed by Sysco Foods of Arkansas LLC re #31 Order Appointing Counsel, DEFENDANT SYSCO FOODS OF ARKANSAS, LLCS BRIEF ADDRESSING ISSUES ON REMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Holleman, John)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting Lateshia Patillo's motion for appointment of counsel and appointing attorney Daveante Jones for Lateshia Patillo. The Court directs Sysco Foods of Arkansas, LLC, to file a brief addressing the issues on remand on or before 2/14/2018. Patillo's response will be due on or before 2/28/2018. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/17/2018. (mcz)
December 27, 2017 Filing 30 MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the opinion and judgment of 12/06/2017, as to #25 Notice of Appeal filed by Lateshia Patillo. (mcz)
December 6, 2017 Filing 29 USCA JUDGMENT as to #25 Notice of Appeal filed by Lateshia Patillo: The judgment of the district court in this cause is vacated and the cause is remanded to the district court for proceedings consistent with the opinion of this court. (cmn)
December 6, 2017 Filing 28 OPINION of USCA as to #25 Notice of Appeal filed by Lateshia Patillo. (cmn)
January 17, 2017 Filing 27 USCA Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule as to #25 Notice of Appeal filed by Lateshia Patillo. The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, CDs, videos, administrative records and state court files. USCA Case Number 17-1110. (mcz)
January 13, 2017 Filing 26 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #25 Notice of Appeal filed by Lateshia Patillo re: #23 Order and #24 Judgment. (mcz)
January 13, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #23 Order and #24 Judgment, by Lateshia Patillo. (mcz)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the #23 Opinion and Order entered separately today, the complaint of Lateshia Patillo against Sysco Foods of Arkansas, LLC, is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/16/2016. (ljb)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER granting Sysco's #15 motion to dismiss. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/16/2016. (ljb)
December 15, 2016 Filing 22 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #21 Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Reply in Support of Defendant Sysco Foods of Arkansas LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Lateshia Patillo. (jap)
December 15, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION to Strike #20 #16 #15 by Lateshia Patillo (jap)
December 12, 2016 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SYSCO FOODS OF ARKANSAS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Holleman, John)
December 7, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #19 Amended Response. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "Amended RESPONSE in OPPOSITION re #18 Response in Opposition to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS and Added Addendum filed by Lateshia Patillo". (jak)
December 6, 2016 Filing 19 Amended RESPONSE in OPPOSITION re #18 Response in Opposition to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS and Added Addendum filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg) (Docket text modified on 12/7/2016 to correct the linkage). (jak)
December 1, 2016 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lateshia Patillo. (scw)
November 21, 2016 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holleman, John)
November 21, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () by All Defendants (Holleman, John)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying at this time Lateshia Patillo's #11 motion for appointment of counsel. If the case proceeds to trial, the Court will reconsider the motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/14/2016. (ljb)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting the #10 and #12 motions for admission pro hac vice of Kelline R. Linton and Dennis P. Duffy to appear as co-counsel for the defendant in this action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/14/2016. (ljb)
November 11, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by DENNIS P. DUFFY. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-2950884. Filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Holleman, John)
November 10, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Lateshia Patillo. (fjg)
November 8, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kelline R Linton. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-2949107. Filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Holleman, John)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT: Defendant's deadline to file its response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint is 11/25/2016. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/7/2016. (ljb)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing plaintiff's attention to the fact that plaintiff is required to be familiar and comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Plaintiff is hereby instructed to be familiar and comply with said Rules. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve this Order on plaintiff by both regular mail and certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/7/2016. (ljb)
November 4, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Holleman on behalf of All Defendants (Holleman, John)
November 4, 2016 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
October 20, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Sysco Foods of Arkansas LLC served on 10/14/2016. (scw)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff Lateshia Patillo's #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's case may proceed without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. The United States Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas is directed to serve the summons and complaint on the defendant in this action pursuant to the provisions of Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/7/2016. (ljb)
October 7, 2016 Summons Issued as to Sysco Foods of Arkansas LLC and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/6/2016. (ljb)
October 6, 2016 Filing 2 COMPLAINT UNDER TITLE VII OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964 against Sysco Foods of Arkansas LLC filed by Lateshia Patillo. (ljb)
October 6, 2016 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lateshia Patillo. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patillo v. Sysco Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Foods of Arkansas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Arkansas
Represented By: Dennis P. Duffy
Represented By: Kelline R. Linton
Represented By: John Holleman
Represented By: Joseph Richard Buller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lateshia Patillo
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?