Cat Claws Inc v. Big Lots Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: Cat Claws Inc
Defendant: Big Lots Stores Inc, Does 1-10, Pet Luv Products LLC and Big Lots Stores Inc an Ohio corporation doing business as Big Lots!
Case Number: 4:2016cv00733
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Conway
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Filing 31 REPORT of the Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by the Clerk of Court on 10/17/2017. (thd)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF DISMISSAL dismissing with prejudice the complaint and all claims in this action against the defendants. The Court retains complete jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this Order and to reopen the action if it is satisfactorily shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/17/2017. (cmn)
October 12, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Cat Claws Inc (Calhoun, Joseph)
July 19, 2017 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #27 Answer to Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include the text "and COUNTERCLAIM against Cat Claws Inc." (thd)
July 19, 2017 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #28 Response. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "ANSWER to #27 Counterclaim." (thd)
July 18, 2017 Filing 28 ANSWER to #27 Counterclaim filed by Cat Claws Inc (Calhoun, Joseph) (Docket text modified on 7/19/2017 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
June 27, 2017 Filing 27 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand and COUNTERCLAIM against Cat Claws Inc filed by Big Lots Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fishbone Reference, #2 Exhibit Cheese Scratcher Reference)(Perkins, G.) (Docket text modified on 7/19/2017 to include a reference to the Counterclaim.)(thd).
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Partial Dismissal. Count II of the complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/13/2017. (jak)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/25/2018 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright; Discovery due by 1/26/2018; Motions due by 2/26/2018; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/25/2018. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/19/2017. (mcn)
May 16, 2017 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Big Lots Stores Inc. (Perkins, G.)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend Time. The parties have up to and including May 16, 2017 in which to filed a Joint Rule 26(f) Report. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 05/16/2017. (jjb)
May 15, 2017 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to file Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Big Lots Stores Inc (Perkins, G.)
March 15, 2017 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Big Lots Stores Inc. (Perkins, G.)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Charlie C. Lyu is admitted to the bar of this Court for the limited purpose of appearing as counsel for Big Lots Stores, Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 03/14/2017. (jjb)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. John S. Letchinger is admitted to the bar of this Court for the limited purpose of appearing as counsel for Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 03/14/2017. (jjb)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant is directed to file its reply within five days from the date of this entry. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 03/14/2017. (jjb)
March 13, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Partial Motion to Dismiss by Big Lots Stores Inc (Perkins, G.)
March 10, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Charlie C. Lyu. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3013835. Filed by Big Lots Stores Inc (Perkins, G.)
March 10, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Letchinger. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3013830. Filed by Big Lots Stores Inc (Perkins, G.)
March 8, 2017 Filing 14 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #13 Response to Motion lacks an attorney's correct electronic signature format (General Order 53). (jak)
March 7, 2017 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cat Claws Inc. (Calhoun, Joseph) Additional attachment added on 3/10/2017: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)
February 23, 2017 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/1/2017; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/15/2017; Jury Trial set for 2/12/2018 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #A530 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed at the direction of the Court on 2/23/2017. (mcn)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc.'s answer or response to the amended complaint is due fourteen days after the Court rules on the pending motion for partial dismissal (7). Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/23/2017. (jjb)
February 21, 2017 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint by Big Lots Stores Inc (Perkins, G.)
February 21, 2017 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Big Lots Stores Inc (Perkins, G.)
February 21, 2017 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Big Lots Stores Inc. (Perkins, G.)
February 21, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Big Lots Stores Inc (Perkins, G.)
February 21, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Alan Perkins on behalf of Big Lots Stores Inc (Perkins, G.)
December 22, 2016 Filing 5 WAIVER by Cat Claws Inc (Calhoun, Joseph)
December 21, 2016 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by the Clerk of Court on 12/21/2016. (thd)
December 21, 2016 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Defendants filed by Cat Claws Inc(Calhoun, Joseph) (Docket text modified on 12/21/2016 to indicate the document is filed against Defendants.) (thd).
December 21, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document is filed against Defendants. (thd)
October 11, 2016 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing of an Action regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by the Clerk of Court on 10/11/2016. (thd)
October 7, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants filed by Cat Claws Inc. (Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT058740.)Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cat Claws Inc v. Big Lots Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cat Claws Inc
Represented By: Joseph Davidson Calhoun, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Lots Stores Inc
Represented By: Charlie C. Lyu
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: John S. Letchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pet Luv Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Lots Stores Inc an Ohio corporation doing business as Big Lots!
Represented By: Charlie C. Lyu
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: John S. Letchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?