USA v. One Financial Corporation

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 4:2016mc00001
Filed: January 13, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting 10 Motion to Transfer. The Court directs the Clerk to immediately transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/22/2016. (jak)
March 21, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/21/2016. (jak)
March 1, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Application for writ of execution, 2 , granted. A signed writ will follow. The Court directs the Clerk to issue the attached Clerk's notice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/1/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Represented By: Adam R. Tarosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?