Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dillard's Inc

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Dillard's Inc
Case Number: 4:2016mc00008
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Second joint status report 36 noted and appreciated. Proposed questionnaire schedule, 36 at 2, approved and adopted. Proposed schedule for disclosure of responses, 36 at 3, approved and adopted. For now, things stay in the EEOC's capable hands. Dillard's lawyers are entitled to more information if the sampling hits a snag and full information when the process is done. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/2017. (jak)
August 22, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified the EEOC's application to enforce the subpoena, 1 . By 9/2/2016, Dillard's must produce the requested information, as limited by the parties' agreement at the hearing, about Dillard's Little Rock-based Executive Development Program that was compiled for Dr. Metzger's review. By 9/19/2016, Dillard's must produce the employee information, limited to black and mixed-race current and former employees at retail locations and they must further supplement its production on the Executive Development Program. If a second supplement on that Program is needed, it's due by 10/3/2016. By 10/3/2016, the EEOC must propose to Dillard's how best to make inquiry to current and former employe es to achieve a representative sample, while minimizing the likelihood of disruption to Dillard's business. By 10/3/2016 the EEOC must also propose to Dillard's the draft cover letter and questionnaire. The Court directs good faith collaboration on all these issues. Joint report on sample size and method, as well as on the draft cover letter and questionnaire due by 10/14/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/22/2016. (jak)
June 7, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the EEOC's motion for an order to show case, 1 , why Dillard's Inc., should not have to comply with a subpoena duces tecum from the Commission. The Court requests a response from Dillard's to the EEOC's subpoena by 1 July 2016. Any reply from the EEOC is due by 13 July 2016. The Court orders a person authorized to speak for Dillard's to appear and explain why the company shouldn't be compelled by the Court to comply with the subpoena. The show-cause hearing will be held in courtroom B155, Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas 72201, on 22 July 2016 at 9:00 a.m. If a party fails to appear at the hearing, the Court will consider imposing a sanction . The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve this Order on Dillard's Inc.'s registered agent for service, the Corporation Company, by certified mail as soon as practicable and file a return in due course. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/7/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dillard's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Pamela B. Dixon
Represented By: Gerald L. Thornton, Sr.
Represented By: Faye A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's Inc
Represented By: J. Bruce Cross
Represented By: Madeline Kurrus Moore
Represented By: Steven W. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?