Jones v. Murry et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Randolph Jones
Defendant: Randy Murry, Tracy Sutterfield, John Willoby and Destin Linkous
Case Number: 4:2017cv00021
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Van Buren
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JUDGMENT: Consistent with 42 Order that was entered on this day, this case is dismissed with prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and the corresponding Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/13/2017. (cmn)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER approving and adopting the 36 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in all respects; granting 34 Defendant Linkous's Motion to Dismiss and dismissing him without prejudice as a party to this cause of action; and certifying, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/21/2017. (mef)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER adopting the 29 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety as my findings in all respects; granting 26 Defendant Willoughby's Motion to Dismiss; dismissing Willoughby without prejudice as a party to this cause of action; denying 28 Defendant Linkous's Motion to Dismiss without prejudice; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/28/2017. (mef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Murry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Randolph Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Murry
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Sutterfield
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Willoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Destin Linkous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?