McGehee v. Hutchinson et al
Plaintiff: |
Jason McGehee |
Defendant: |
Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley, John Felts, John Belken, Andy Shock, Abraham Carpenter, Jr, Dawne Benafield Vandiver, Jerry Riley and Lona H McCastlain |
Case Number: |
4:2017cv00195 |
Filed: |
March 28, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Little Rock Office |
County: |
Lincoln |
Presiding Judge: |
D. P. Marshall |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 16, 2017 |
Filing
9
ORDER: The Court appreciates the 79 Supplemental Status Report from the State Defendants. The Court dismisses Stacey Johnson's claims without prejudice as moot. The 32 preliminary injunction is dissolved. McGehee's claims are now moot, too. The Court separates the cases and will enter judgment in each, dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/16/2017. (jak)
|
April 6, 2017 |
Filing
7
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Intervene and 15 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court defers assessment of the filing fee, and refers the fee issue to Magistrate Judge Ray to decide in due course. The 19 & 20 Motions to Dismiss are partly grant ed and partly denied. All of Bruce Ward's claims are dismissed without prejudice for lack of standing. He's no longer a party. The 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is partly granted, partly denied, and held in abeyance as to Jones. Whe n the Board gives public notice of its recommendation about Jones, the Board Defendants must also notify this Court. The Court stays Jason McGehee's execution and enjoins Governor Asa Hutchinson and Arkansas Department of Correction Director Wen dy Kelley from carrying out McGehee's death sentence until the Arkansas Parole Board complies with Ark. Code Ann.§ 16-93-204(e) and until Governor Hutchinson acts on the Board's recommendation. In due course, the Board Defendants must file notice of statutory compliance. Thereafter, whenever the Governor exercises his discretion and acts on the Board's merit recommendation about McGehee, the Governor must file notice of his decision. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/6/2017. (jak)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?