Laymance v. Shourd et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Dean Laymance
Defendant: Ricky Shourd, Paul Hofstead, Ricky Smith, Felicia Hickerson, Monica Cole, Ronnie Foster, Gary Taylor, Sharon Van Compernolle and John Van Compernolle
Case Number: 4:2017cv00303
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JUDGMENT: Laymance's claims against Shourd, Hofstead, Walker, White County, and Anderson County are dismissed with prejudice. All other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/6/2019. (jak)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER adopting 38 Partial Recommendation. 34 Motion to dismiss granted. Laymance's remaining claims against Sharon and John Van Compernolle are dismissed without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/10/2019. (jak)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Monica Cole, Ricky Smith, Felicia Hickerson, Ronnie Foster, Gary Taylor, and Matthew Hester are all dismissed without prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk to prepare summonses for Sharon Von Compernolle, John Von Compernolle, Ricky Shourd, Paul Hofstead, and Casey Walker The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the 23 Complaint, summons, and this Order on each of them without prepayment of fees and costs or security. The Court refers this case to Magistrate Judge Ray for further proceedings, including a recommendation on any dispositive motions. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/30/2019. (jak)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 10 and 11 Laymance must pay the filing fee but over time. The Court assesses an initial partial fee of $6.10. Laymance's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from Laymance's prison trust account to the C lerk of the Court until the $350.00 has been paid in full. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this order to the Warden of the Grimes Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the ADC Compliance Office. Laymance's m otions for service and for appointed counsel, No. 12 & 13 , are denied without prejudice. This case is stayed. Laymance can move to reopen this case after final disposition of his state case, including any appeal. If Laymance doesn't file a timely motion to reopen or a status report by 8/24/2018, then the Court will reopen the case and dismiss it without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/23/2017. (jak)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice 1 and 7 Motions. Laymance must submit a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis, certificate, and certified calculation sheet by 8/26/2017. The Court directs the Clerk to send Laymance a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/26/2017. (jak)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/12/2017. (jak)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Laymance's mail is being returned undelivered. If he doesn't update his address with the Court by 6/19/2017, then his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/18/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laymance v. Shourd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Dean Laymance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Shourd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hofstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Van Compernolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Van Compernolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?