Thurmond v. Elkins et al
Plaintiff: Sam Edward Thurmond, Sr
Defendant: Dellwyn Elkins, Conway Police Department, Gordan Ball, Keith B Faulkner and Conway, City of
Case Number: 4:2017cv00314
Filed: May 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety 98 Proposed Findings and Recommendations as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claims; denying as moot 85 Defendants' ; motion for summary judgment; dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's state law claims; dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's complaint; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommendation and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/4/2019. (ljb)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety 68 Proposed Findings and Recommendations as this Court's findings in all respects; denying without prejudice 53 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and holding in abeyance 58 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment until after the close of discovery. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/4/2018. (ljb)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER approving and adopting 34 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Ryan M. Britton and Sara E. Ault for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; and certifying an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommendation would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/13/2017. (cmn)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Adopting 7 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Defendants Conway Police Department and Keith Faulkner are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/9/2017. (mcz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thurmond v. Elkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Edward Thurmond, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dellwyn Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordan Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith B Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?