Coates v. Dassault Falcon Jet Corp et al
Plaintiff: Craig Coates
Defendant: Dassault Falcon Jet Corp and Dassault Aircraft Services Corp
Case Number: 4:2017cv00372
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 170 Opinion and Order entered separately today, judgment is entered in favor of the plaintiffs against Dassault Falcon Jet Corporation for attorneys' fees and costs in the total amount of $151,785.08, for all of which garnishment and execution may issue. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/8/2019. (ljb)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FOR PLAINTIFF DENNIS CAMPBELL dismissing with prejudice any and all claims asserted by Mr. Dennis Campbell; and terminating him as a party in this case. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/22/2019. (ljb)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 OPINION AND ORDER granting 119 plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration; and denying 121 Dassault's motion for reconsideration. Team leaders and production liaisons are not exempt under the administrative, executive, or highly compensa ted employee exemptions. The Court's order decertifying the team-leader FLSA collective action is set aside. Team leaders remain certified as a collective action, along with production liaisons. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/31/2018. (ljb)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OPINION AND ORDER denying 91 Dassault's motion for summary judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 83 plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment. Team leaders and production liaisons are not paid on a salary basis and therefore are not exempt as executive or administrative employees. At this stage, the Court cannot determine as a matter of law whether the team leaders are highly compensated employees or whether the office personnel are administrative employees. These questions, along with whether the office personnel can prove damages and the extent of unpaid overtime damages, are reserved for trial. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/9/2018. (ljb)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER granting the 17 plaintiffs' motion for conditional class certification and court-authorized notice. The proposed notice is approved subject to the amendments required hereinabove. Before sending notices, plaintiffs' lawyers must submit the form of notice to the defendant's lawyers to confirm that the required amendments have been made. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/21/2017. (ljb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coates v. Dassault Falcon Jet Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Coates
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dassault Falcon Jet Corp
Represented By: Brian Anthony Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dassault Aircraft Services Corp
Represented By: Brian Anthony Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?