Green v. Arkansas, State of
Plaintiff: Charles Green
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Case Number: 4:2017cv00422
Filed: June 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 9 Motion. Nothing in Green's motion warrants relief under Rule 60(b). The Court stands by its 7/31/2017 Order and Judgment, 6 and 7 . This case is closed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/18/2017. (jak)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT: Green's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/31/2017. (jak)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/12/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?