Catar Clinic of Hot Springs LLC et al v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Catar Clinic of Hot Springs LLC and Stockton Medical Group LTD
Defendant: Thomas F Robinson, Arkansas Recovery Clinic, Arc Rehabilitation Center PA, CSCB Rehabilitation Management Group LLC, Addiction Recovery Care of Little Rock, Arc Clinic, Jane Doe and Tiffany Terry
Case Number: 4:2017cv00520
Filed: August 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER denying 348 Motion to reduce the fee award against Steppig to Judgment. The Court directs Steppig to resume monthly payments of at least $325. 352 Motion for contempt and a hearing is denied. The Court quashes the subpoenas to Petit and Keet, LLC, Mr. James Rankin, Google Inc., Catar Clinic of Hot Springs LLC, and Stockton Medical Group, Ltd. 353 Motion to seal records is denied without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/9/2019. (jak)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 JUDGMENT: All claims against Jill Cogburn are dismissed without prejudice for lack of service. All other claims against all other parties are dismissed with prejudice based on the parties' settlements. The Court retains jurisdiction until 7/31/2020 to enforce the settlements and the fee award. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/26/2019. (jak)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting 343 Joint motion. The Court directs the Clerk to disburse the $25,000 to C.A.T.A.R., Ltd., care of PPGMR Law, LLC. If any party has any objection to the proposed terms of judgment, or sees any additional ground hat needs covering in it, please file a notice by 6/21/2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/11/2019. (jak)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER denying without prejudice 224 Motion for contempt. Steppig must pay as much as he feasibly can toward the attorney's fee award, No. 188 , by the end of each month; the first payment is due no later than 11/30/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/14/2018. (jak)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER resolving the parties' current discovery issues. Joint reports 236 , 237 , 238 , & 239 addressed. The 11/30/2018 discovery cutoff will not be extended. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/19/2018. (jak)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on all the pending discovery disputes, No. 236 , 237 , 238 , and 239 , at 9:00 a.m. on 10/19/2018 in courtroom B-155. The 240 Motion to seal is granted with directions. Redacted exhibits due by 10/18/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/11/2018. (jak)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/10/2018. (jak)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER: The Clerk received the $2,000 check for the imposed fine, 208 . Copy of check and receipt attached. 214 Motion to continue granted as modified. 211 Show Cause Order is discharged without prejudice to the Court considering CSCB's delayed payment of the fine in due course if CSCB fails to comply with another Court order. 213 Joint Status Report noted. The Court sets 9/28/2018 as the deadline for filing a detailed report of any remaining discovery disputes. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/13/2018. (jak)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER: The Court attaches the email from Steppig in Order No. 209 to complete the record. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/6/2018. (jak)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER directing CSCB Rehabilitation Management Group LLC to appear on 9/17/2018 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom B-155 of the Richard S. Arnold U.S. Courthouse to show cause why it should not be held in contempt for not paying the $2,000 fine by the extended deadline of 8/3/2018. Chase Steppig and Christopher Branch must both attend the 9/17/2018 hearing. Joint status report from all parties on discovery due by 9/10/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/28/2018. (jak)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER: The Court has not received the actual check as ordered by 208 Order. CSCB must pay the fine as soon as practicable, but no later than 8/3/2018. It is now 7 days late. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/27/2018. (jak)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER discharging the 180 Show Cause Order. ARC has complied. The Court imposes a fine on CSCB of $500 per calendar day for each day that CSCB's $12,500 bond obligation remains unsatisfied. The fine will start accruing 6/14/2018. 189 and 199 Motions denied without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/13/2018. (jak)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER: The Court received the attached note and cover letter from Steppig with the 199 Motion to compel. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/12/2018. (jak)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER: Christopher Branch is welcome to attend the 6/13/2018 hearing bu the Court will not require him to attend on such short notice. The Court directs CSCB's lawyer to make certain that Branch knows all the hearing details and that he may appear if he so chooses. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/6/2018. (jak)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER: On 5/21/2018 the Clerk received $12,500 from Dr. Thomas F. Robinson for ARC Rehabilitation Center's half of the bond ordered by No. 137 , receipt attached. ARC Rehab must still appear at next week's hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/5/2018. (jak)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: The part of Plaintiffs' 189 Motion that requests an ex parte temporary restraining order is denied; and the part that requests a preliminary injunction remains pending. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/4/2018. (jak)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting as modified 140 Motion. The Court orders Chase Steppig to reimburse Catar Clinic of Hot Springs, LLC and Stockton Medical Group, Ltd., in the amount of $19,595 for attorney's fees, paralegal fees, and expenses incurred on the contempt-related issues. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/1/2018. (jak)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER denying without prejudice 160 Motion to strike and dismiss counterclaims. 175 Motion to amend granted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/18/2018. (jak)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER denying 178 Motion to approve the proposed bond. CSCB and ARC must appear before the Court and show cause why they should not be held in contempt of this Court's 137 and 173 Orders at 8:30 a.m. on 6/13/2018 in Courtroom lA in Lit tle Rock, Arkansas. The Court directs the U.S. Marshals Service to serve a copy of this Order, 137 Order, and 173 Order on CSCB and ARC by serving Steppig and Dr. Robinson by personal service by 5/31/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/17/2018. (Appendix A filed under seal.) (jak) (Docket text modified on 5/17/2018 to correct the text and include a reference to sealed Appendix A.) (thd)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER partly granting and partly denying 165 Motion. They must deliver the cash, cash equivalent, or third-party bond to the Clerk of Court by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 5/15/2018. The Court has been patient, but we are approaching the two-month anniversary of the Court's Order requiring a bond, and it is time for compliance. The Court will not extend the deadline again. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/8/2018. (jak)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER: The Court has received CSCB's 165 Motion to approve its bond proposal. Any response or objection due by 5/7/2018. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/1/2018. (jak)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER denying 148 Motion to file patient information under seal. None of Catar's papers about attorney's fees contain patient information, 140 & 141 . If need be, Steppig can identify various individuals as Patient One, Patient Two, Patient Three, and so on. The Court appreciates Steppig's caution about the patient information. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/11/2018. (jak)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER partly granting and partly denying 49 & 51 Motions. 102 Motion is denied. 117 Motion to amend is granted with a caveat. Amended Complaint due by 3/20/2018. 123 Motion granted; docket entries 119 & 120 are stricken. 126 Motion to substitute counsel is granted. Buzbee and Price are substituted for Worsham as counsel for CSCB and the fictitious entities to the extent CSCB is the one doing business through them. 130 Motion to intervene denied. 135 Motion granted. Brewer is substituted as counsel for Dr. Robinson, ARC Rehabilitation Center, P.A., and for the fictitious entities to the extent ARC is the one doing business through them, No. 132 & 134 . Joint status report No. 136 addressed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/16/2018. (jak)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 111 Motion. Luther Oneal Sutter is substituted as counsel of record for Tiffany Terry. 112 Motion is partly granted and partly denied without prejudice. Worsham is relieved as counsel of record for the individual defendants - Robin son, Terry, and Jane Doe #1. The remaining defendants though need new counsel before Worsham can be relieved. New counsel must appear as soon as practicable but no later than 2/23/2018. Worsham must remain counsel of record for the entities until another lawyer appears for them. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/22/2018. (jak)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Motion. Reply under seal due by 1/5/2018. Steppig must also file a redacted version on the public docket by the same date. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/27/2017. (jak)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: 78 Joint Report appreciated. The Court looks forward to the planned supplemental report by 11/24/2017. If these issues are not resolved by agreement by that date, then a hearing will be held at 1:30 p.m. on 12/11/2017 in Courtroom B155 of th e Richard S. Arnold United States Courthouse, 600 W. Capitol A venue, Little Rock, Arkansas. Chase Steppig and Michael Casillas must appear at the hearing and are entitled to be represented by their own lawyers. Counsel, though, must appear as soon a s possible and no later than 12/4/2017. The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve this Order on Steppig and Casillas personally, not by mail, as soon as practicable and no later than 12/1/2017. The Court will provide contact information for each directly to the Marshal. The Marshal must file proof of service. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/17/2017. (jak)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 40 Motion for clarification or modification. The conflict issue is beyond the current papers. The Court directs counsel to confer in person about that issue. Any motion to disqualify due by 10/6/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/18/2017. (jak)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: The Court hear argument, and took evidence, on possible injunctive relief at a hearing held on 8/31/2017 and 9/1/2017. The Court made three rulings: Subject matter jurisdiction exists; The 4 Motion for preliminary injunction is denied; and All defendants must preserve every record they have that relates to this dispute. The Court confirms that the agreed standstill order, 24 , has expired. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/7/2017. (jak)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting as modified 28 Joint Motion. The courtroom will be closed, and the transcript sealed, when any current or former patient testifies. Counsel should prepare two versions of any exhibit containing protected information about a patient: one version that has been redacted, which will be public, and one version without any redactions, which will be sealed. If redaction is impracticable, though, then only the complete version, which will be sealed, is needed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/29/2017. (jak)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting defendants' 16 & 17 motions to postpone the injunction hearing. Between now and the hearing: (1) defendants will not solicit or reach out to plaintiffs' patients; (2) defendants will keep safe and not destroy any HIPAA-pr otected patient information they possess that might have belonged to plaintiffs; (3) defendants will not use any of that information, other than in the treatment of defendants' existing patients. The Court reschedules the preliminary injunction hearing for 1:00 p.m., Thursday, 8/31/2017 in Courtroom B-155 of the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse. Defendants may supplement their response to the motion for injunction by 5:00 p.m. 8/28/2017; and plaintiffs may reply by noon on 8/30/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/2017. (jak)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Verified complaint, No. 1 , noted. The embedded request for immediate injunctive relief is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/16/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catar Clinic of Hot Springs LLC et al v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catar Clinic of Hot Springs LLC
Represented By: Micah Goodwin
Represented By: Julie DeWoody Greathouse
Represented By: James D. Rankin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stockton Medical Group LTD
Represented By: Micah Goodwin
Represented By: Julie DeWoody Greathouse
Represented By: James D. Rankin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F Robinson
Represented By: Richard E. Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Recovery Clinic
Represented By: Richard E. Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arc Rehabilitation Center PA
Represented By: Richard E. Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSCB Rehabilitation Management Group LLC
Represented By: Richard E. Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addiction Recovery Care of Little Rock
Represented By: Richard E. Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arc Clinic
Represented By: Richard E. Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Represented By: Richard E. Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Terry
Represented By: Richard E. Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?